MINOR v. EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Plaintiff: LEONTE R. MINOR
Defendant: EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 3:2020cv00198
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #3 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to LEONTE R. MINOR, 1415 E. Adams St., Evansville, IN. (AAS)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT AND ORDER TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Complaint fails to allege any claimthat section of the Complaint is blank. Accordingly, Minor's Complaint (Filing No. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. If Minor chooses to refile his Complaint, he must do so by September 30, 2020. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/1/2020.(JRB)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/1/2020. (AAS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LEONTE R. MINOR. (REO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by LEONTE R. MINOR. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MINOR v. EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONTE R. MINOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?