SCHELLER v. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: RONALD J SCHELLER
Defendant: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2020cv00287
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2021. Status Conference set for 4/9/2021 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
February 15, 2021 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY . (Wheeler, Stephen)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on FEBRUARY 22, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/8/2021.(AAS)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY.(Wheeler, Stephen)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Wheeler, Stephen)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Charles Wheeler on behalf of Defendant AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Wheeler, Stephen)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Posey Superior Court, case number 65D01-2012-PL-000392, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6346065) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Summons, Complaint, Appearance by Plaintiff, Appearance by Defendant, Jury Trial Request by Defendant, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Enlargement of Time), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wheeler, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHELLER v. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD J SCHELLER
Represented By: David K. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Stephen Charles Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?