ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC v. FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC
Plaintiff: ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC
Defendant: FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00081
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time - The Stipulated Extension of Time is GRANTED and the Defendant shall have until July 30, 2021 to file an Answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/15/2021. (AAS)
July 14, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/30/2021 for Defendant to file Answer, filed by Defendant FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, C.)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on AUGUST 2, 2021 at 9:30 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/16/2021.(AAS)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and the Defendant shall have until July 15, 2021 to file an Answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/15/2021. (AAS)
June 14, 2021 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/15/2021 to File Answer or Responsive Pleading, filed by Defendant FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING MOTION)(Martin, C.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Richard Martin on behalf of Defendant FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC. (Martin, C.)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Eric R. Malmgren for ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC added. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that Eric R. Malmgren register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by June 9, 2021. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/26/2021. (AAS)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Steven J. Nataupsky for ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/26/2021. (JRB)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Lynda J. Zadra-Symes for ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/26/2021. (JRB) (Main Document 13 replaced on 5/27/2021) (TMB).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paul A. Stewart for ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/26/2021. (JRB)
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul A. Stewart to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6576436), filed by Plaintiff ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certification of Paul Stewart, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, James) Modified text on 5/25/2021 (TMB).
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lynda J. Zadra-Symes to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6576448), filed by Plaintiff ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certification of Lynda Zadra-Symes, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, James)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - CORRECTED ENTRY APPEARS AT #11 *** MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul A. Stewart to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6576436), filed by Plaintiff ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certification of Paul Stewart, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, James) Modified text on 5/25/2021 (TMB).
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric Malmgren to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6576433), filed by Plaintiff ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certification of Eric Malmgren, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, James)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven J. Nataupsky to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6576426), filed by Plaintiff ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certification of Steven Nataupsky, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, James)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC. (AAS)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC identifying Corporate Parent MONSTER BEVERAGE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent COCA COLA COMPANY for ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC.. (Riley, James)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Michelle Flint on behalf of Plaintiff ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Flint, Jaclyn)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Riley, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Riley, James)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, Trade Dress Infringement, False Designation of Origin, and Unfair Competition against FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC, filed by ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6569350) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. US2957843, #2 Exhibit 2. US5562250, #3 Exhibit 3. US5722956, #4 Exhibit 2. 2020-10-20 MSB Ltr to Full Throttle Auto, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Riley, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC v. FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENERGY BEVERAGES LLC
Represented By: James W. Riley, Jr.
Represented By: Jaclyn Michelle Flint
Represented By: Eric R. Malmgren
Represented By: Lynda J. Zadra-Symes
Represented By: Paul A. Stewart
Represented By: Steven J. Nataupsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULL THROTTLE AUTOMOTIVE LLC
Represented By: C. Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?