BIK HYDRAULICS LTD v. GRAY et al
Plaintiff: BIK HYDRAULICS LTD
Defendant: RYAN GRAY, R.L. GRAYS UNDERGROUND LLC and GRAY'S TREE & CRANE LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00201
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - The above case is hereby assigned for an INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on March 1, 2023 at 9:00 a.m., Evansville Time (CST), TELEPHONIC, before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/27/2022.(AAS)
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by All Defendants.(Wheeler, Stephen)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS)
December 9, 2022 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by RYAN GRAY, GRAY'S TREE & CRANE LLC, R.L. GRAYS UNDERGROUND LLC. (Wheeler, Stephen)
December 9, 2022 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by RYAN GRAY, GRAY'S TREE & CRANE LLC, R.L. GRAYS UNDERGROUND LLC. (Wheeler, Stephen)
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Charles Wheeler on behalf of Defendants RYAN GRAY, GRAY'S TREE & CRANE LLC, R.L. GRAYS UNDERGROUND LLC. (Wheeler, Stephen)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vanderburgh Superior Court, case number 82D06-2211-PL-005312, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7406688) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, etc., #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wheeler, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIK HYDRAULICS LTD v. GRAY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIK HYDRAULICS LTD
Represented By: Edward M. Smid
Represented By: Michael Jay Bruzzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN GRAY
Represented By: Stephen Charles Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L. GRAYS UNDERGROUND LLC
Represented By: Stephen Charles Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAY'S TREE & CRANE LLC
Represented By: Stephen Charles Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?