CURTIS v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: BRENDA CURTIS
Defendant: MICHAEL J. ASTRUE
Case Number: 4:2007cv00148
Filed: November 9, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: New Albany Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: David Frank Hamilton
Referring Judge: William G Hussmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2008 Filing 22 CLOSED REMANDED to the Social Security Administration, Office of Hearings and Appeals, for further proceedings consistent with the court's Entry on Judicial Review. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 11/3/08.(LBT) Modified on 12/24/2008 (LBT).
November 3, 2008 Filing 21 ENTRY on Judicial Review. The case is remanded for further consideration of Ms. Curtis' narcolepsy in light of all the available evidence, and any other action necessary to issue a decision consistent with this entry. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 11/3/08.(LBT)
May 23, 2008 Filing 20 Brief in Reply to Defendant's Memorandum re #19 Brief(Social Security Appeal) by BRENDA CURTIS. (Schad, Larry)
May 9, 2008 Filing 19 Brief Defendant's Memorandum in Support of the Commissioner's Decision by MICHAEL J. ASTRUE. (Kieper, Thomas)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time until 4/14/2008, to serve response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr on 4/14/2008. (KTK)
April 11, 2008 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to May 14, 2008, filed by Defendant MICHAEL J. ASTRUE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kieper, Thomas)
March 14, 2008 Filing 16 Brief PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT by BRENDA CURTIS. (Schad, Larry)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time until 3/14/2008, to file plaintiff's initial brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Hussmann, Jr on 2/11/2008. (KTK)
February 8, 2008 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/14/08, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA CURTIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting enlargement of time)(Schad, Larry)
January 17, 2008 Filing 12 ENTRY ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 1/17/08.(JLM)
January 16, 2008 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT of SSA Proceedings, 1 Volume. (KTK)
January 15, 2008 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (SSA), filed by MICHAEL J. ASTRUE.(Kieper, Thomas)
January 15, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing (Manual) of Transcript by MICHAEL J. ASTRUE (Kieper, Thomas)
January 15, 2008 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by MICHAEL J. ASTRUE. (Kieper, Thomas)
January 15, 2008 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kieper on behalf of Defendant MICHAEL J. ASTRUE. (Kieper, Thomas)
December 28, 2007 Filing 7 Reassignment of Case to Judge David Frank Hamilton. Judge John Daniel Tinder no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number ( 4:07-cv-148-DFH-WGH), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JLM)
November 14, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry J. Schad on behalf of Plaintiff BRENDA CURTIS. (TMD)
November 9, 2007 Filing 5 RECEIPT # NA 000271 in the amount of $ 350.00, filing fee. (KTK)
November 9, 2007 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KTK)
November 9, 2007 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USA - MICHAEL J. ASTRUE, U. S. Attorney General and U. S. Attorney. (KTK)
November 9, 2007 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA CURTIS. (KTK)
November 9, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (SSA) against MICHAEL J. ASTRUE, filed by BRENDA CURTIS.(KTK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CURTIS v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA CURTIS
Represented By: Larry J. Schad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. ASTRUE
Represented By: Thomas E. Kieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?