STALEY v. COLVIN
Plaintiff: BETH STALEY
Defendant: CAROLYN W. COLVIN
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only) and USM (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 4:2015cv00178
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: New Albany Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Presiding Judge: William G. Hussmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED ORDER ON ATTORNEY'S FEES - The Court amends its prior order [Filing No. 48 ] in part. The Commissioner is ordered to pay the $15,846 EAJA fee award directly to Staley, offset by Staley's outstanding debt to the government. The motion for an oral argument [Filing No. 51 ] is denied, as is the motion for leave [Filing No. 52 ]. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/13/2017. (MAT)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES - 39 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Staley's counsel is awarded $15,8463 in attorney's fees, to be paid directly to counsel within 70 days. If during this time the Com missioner discovers that Staley owes an outstanding debt to the government, the Commissioner should file a statement with the Court, along with supporting evidence of the debt, that the Commissioner will exercise the right of offset. Because the Court resolved the EAJA fee petition without addressing the novel issue of disregarding assignments, 46 Motion for Oral Argument is DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/18/2017. (LBT)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - The Commissioner's decision is remanded pursuant to sentence four of the 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further consideration, consistent with this opinion. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/28/2016.(LBT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STALEY v. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN W. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USM (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH STALEY
Represented By: Adriana Maria de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?