WILLIAMS v. AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC

Plaintiff: CURTIS WILLIAMS
Defendant: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00114
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: New Albany Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
June 29, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-02008. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the #6 motion is DENIED insofar as Defendant seeks dismissal for improper venue and GRANTED insofar as Defendant seeks to transfer venue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, New Albany Division, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/28/2018.(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by American Commercial Barge Line LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/21/2018. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
May 20, 2018 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, rec. doc. 6 by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Guichard, Lauren) Modified text on 5/21/2018 (jls). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #8 Request for Oral Argument. If it later appears to the Court that oral argument would be helpful on the underlying #6 motion, it will be ordered. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/16/2018.(jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 8 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Curtis Williams regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue . (Lambert, Hugh) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Curtis Williams re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Curtis Williams, #2 Exhibit A-1. ACBL 2017 Benefits Guide, #3 Exhibit A-2. ACBL letter regarding Pay Continuance, #4 Exhibit A-3. Pay Continuance Form, #5 Exhibit B. Wage Continuation Plan Application, #6 Exhibit C. Vessel Wage Continuation)(Lambert, Hugh) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Notice of Submission, #7 Proposed Order)Attorney Lauren A. Guichard added to party American Commercial Barge Line LLC(pty:dft).(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to American Commercial Barge Line, LLC on 3/1/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. (Lambert, Hugh) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Commercial Barge Line, LLC. (jls) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Lambert, Hugh) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against American Commercial Barge Line, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6685237) filed by Curtis Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Hugh Palmer Lambert added to party Curtis Williams(pty:pla).(Lambert, Hugh) Modified text on 2/27/2018 (jls). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/29/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS WILLIAMS
Represented By: Hugh Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Cayce Christian Peterson
Represented By: Brian C. Mears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN COMMERCIAL BARGE LINE, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Lauren A. Guichard
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Represented By: Danica B. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?