PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC v. CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG et al

Plaintiff: PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC
Defendant: LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, TONY ABBOTT, AARON COOK, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR., RANDY ABNER, KELLY MOLLAUN, OLIN CLAWSON and CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS
Case Number: 4:2018cv00124
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: New Albany Office
0 Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
1 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 30 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to Stay Discovery , filed by Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - September 7, 2018 email to Plaintiffs counsel)(Neibarger, Gregory)
September 13, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Staying Discovery)(Neibarger, Gregory)
September 13, 2018 Filing 28 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Neibarger, Gregory)
September 13, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Neibarger, Gregory)
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC . (Deveau, Frank)
August 30, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake J. Burgan on behalf of Plaintiff PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. (Burgan, Blake)
August 30, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC.(Deveau, Frank)
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Deveau on behalf of Plaintiff PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. (Deveau, Frank)
August 30, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann O. McCready on behalf of Plaintiff PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. (McCready, Ann)
August 10, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan Klem Haller on behalf of Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Haller, Meaghan)
August 9, 2018 Filing 20 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Neibarger, Gregory)
August 9, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Neibarger, Gregory)
August 9, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Neibarger on behalf of Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Neibarger, Gregory)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #224, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/9/2018.(LBT)
August 1, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Lowe, R.)
August 1, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Jeffrey Lowe on behalf of Defendants TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (Lowe, R.)
July 24, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. TONY ABBOTT served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. OLIN CLAWSON served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG served on 7/19/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. KELLY MOLLAUN served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. AARON COOK served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. PAUL SEYMOUR, JR served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 24, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. RANDY ABNER served on 7/20/2018. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TONY ABBOTT, RANDY ABNER, CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG, OLIN CLAWSON, AARON COOK, CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS, LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES, KELLY MOLLAUN, PAUL SEYMOUR, JR. (LBT)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando Luis Diaz on behalf of Plaintiff PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. (Diaz, Fernando)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Equitable Relief, and Damages against All Defendants, filed by PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4969893) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Diaz, Fernando)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC v. CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCEBURG MUNICIPAL UTILITIES
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY ABBOTT
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON COOK
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF LAWRENCEBURG
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL SEYMOUR, JR.
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY ABNER
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MOLLAUN
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIN CLAWSON
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES "MEL" DAVIS
Represented By: Meaghan Klem Haller
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Gregory A. Neibarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROXIMO DISTILLERS, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Luis Diaz
Represented By: Blake J. Burgan
Represented By: Ann O. McCready
Represented By: Frank J. Deveau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?