USA v. $11,835.50 UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND A CHARTER ARMS 357 MAG PUG .38 CALIBER REVOLVER
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $11,835.50 UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND A CHARTER ARMS 357 MAG PUG .38 CALIBER REVOLVER
Claimant: JENNIFER NALLY
Case Number: 4:2018cv00151
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: New Albany Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 Amended Verified Claim to Property Seized, filed by Claimant JENNIFER NALLY. (McCall, William) Modified on 9/27/2018 (LBT).
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Verified Claim to Property Seized, filed by Claimant JENNIFER NALLY. (McCall, William) Modified on 9/25/2018 to remove motion text (LBT).
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Perry McCall, III on behalf of Claimant Jennifer Nally. (McCall, William)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant Jennifer Nally's ANSWER to Complaint , filed by Claimant JENNIFER NALLY.(McCall, William) Modified on 9/13/2018 to identify correct filer (LBT).
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Parker Babbs on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Babbs, Eric)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture in Rem against $11,835.50 UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND A CHARTER ARMS 357 MAG PUG.38 CALIBER REVOLVER, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Babbs, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $11,835.50 UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND A CHARTER ARMS 357 MAG PUG .38 CALIBER REVOLVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,835.50 UNITED STATES CURRENCY AND A CHARTER ARMS 357 MAG PUG .38 CALIBER REVOLVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: JENNIFER NALLY
Represented By: William Perry McCall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?