FIRST HARRISON BANK v. MORMAN et al
Plaintiff: FIRST HARRISON BANK
Defendant: VIRGINIA S. MORMAN, CRAIG ALLEN DOME, MORMAN SOUTHARD, LLC, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and WILLIAM SOUTHARD, JR.
Counter Defendant: HARRISON COUNTY, INDIANA
Case Number: 4:2018cv00155
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #9 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim , filed by VIRGINIA S. MORMAN, MORMAN SOUTHARD, LLC.(Hutson, A.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim , filed by FIRST HARRISON BANK.(Meyer, William)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 Answer of Defendant, William Southard, Jr. ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal/Complaint , filed by WILLIAM SOUTHARD, JR..(Davis, William) Modified on 10/5/2018 to create link to correct document (LBT).
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to CRAIG ALLEN DOME, HARRISON COUNTY, INDIANA, and INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE. (LBT)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Continuance - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 11/5/2018 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The remainder of the court's scheduling order at Dkt. #7 remains in full force and effect. The court FURTHER ORDERS that the counter claimant's motion at Dkt. #10 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/26/2018. (MAT)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference (Amended), filed by Counter Claimant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Sarnell, Bradley)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Counter Claimant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Sarnell, Bradley)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CRAIG ALLEN DOME, FIRST HARRISON BANK, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, VIRGINIA S. MORMAN, MORMAN SOUTHARD, LLC, WILLIAM SOUTHARD, JR., HARRISON COUNTY, INDIANA, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Harrison County, Indiana, #2 Proposed Summons for Craig Allen Dome, #3 Proposed Summons for Indiana Department of Revenue)(Sarnell, Bradley)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 Records Received from Harrison County Clerk case number 31C01-1807-MF-000022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MAT)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/28/2018. (MAT)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to 9/28/2018 to file and serve a response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/28/2018. (MAT)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to September 28, 2018 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Sarnell, Bradley)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal (Amended) (Sarnell, Bradley)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A. Sarnell on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Sarnell, Bradley)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Harrison County, Indiana, case number 31C01-1807-MF-000022, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint with Exhibits, Summons, Answer of Virginia Morman, Motion for Settlement Conference, Order Granting Motion), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarnell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIRST HARRISON BANK v. MORMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA S. MORMAN
Represented By: A. David Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG ALLEN DOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORMAN SOUTHARD, LLC
Represented By: A. David Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Bradley A. Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM SOUTHARD, JR.
Represented By: William H. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST HARRISON BANK
Represented By: William Robert Meyer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: HARRISON COUNTY, INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?