WESBANCO BANK, INC. v. JENNY LYNNE et al
Plaintiff: WESBANCO BANK, INC.
Defendant: DAVID A. EVANCZYK, BYRON S. EVANCZYK, MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION, DAVID W. EVANCZYK, MARINE BUILDERS, INC. and JENNY LYNNE
Case Number: 4:2018cv00184
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Vacate #26 Order Directing U.S. Marshal to serve the Defendant, Jenny Lynne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/20/2018. Paper Copy to USM. (LBT)
November 15, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Vacate #26 Order on Motion directing the US Marshal to complete service on Defendant Jenny Lynne, filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Douglas)
November 15, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants re #27 Summons Issued (Certificate Accepting Service of Summons and Complaint on Behalf of Defendant Jenny Lynne) (Lueken, John)
November 14, 2018 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC. . (Bates, Douglas)
November 12, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Appoint Receiver , filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Bates, Douglas)
November 5, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Appoint Receiver , filed by Defendants BYRON S. EVANCZYK, DAVID W. EVANCZYK, DAVID A. EVANCZYK, JENNY LYNNE, MARINE BUILDERS, INC., MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION. (Lueken, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 28 Documents for service by USM - re #1 Complaint, #26 Order on Motion, #27 Summons Issued. Paper copies to USM.(LBT)
November 2, 2018 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to JENNY LYNNE. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Form)(LBT)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 **VACATED PER NO. 35** ORDER granting #25 Motion for Order Directing U.S. Marshal to Serve Defendant. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve the Complaint (at Dkt. 1, including exhibits 1-19) and Summons (at Dkt. 1-20) herein on the Defendant Jenny Lynne via certified mail/return receipt requested using the address information supplied by the plaintiff. The U.S. Marshal shall file its return of service with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/1/2018. (LBT) Modified on 11/20/2018 (LBT).
October 31, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE DEFENDANT, filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Douglas)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2018 at 1:30 PM (Eastern Time), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/29/2018. (MAT)
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Irving on behalf of Defendants BYRON S. EVANCZYK, DAVID W. EVANCZYK, DAVID A. EVANCZYK, JENNY LYNNE, MARINE BUILDERS, INC., MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION. (Irving, James)
October 25, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Madden on behalf of Defendants BYRON S. EVANCZYK, DAVID W. EVANCZYK, DAVID A. EVANCZYK, JENNY LYNNE, MARINE BUILDERS, INC., MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION. (Madden, Christopher)
October 25, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARINE BUILDERS, INC.. (Lueken, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION. (Lueken, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Lueken, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Lueken on behalf of Defendants BYRON S. EVANCZYK, DAVID W. EVANCZYK, DAVID A. EVANCZYK, JENNY LYNNE, MARINE BUILDERS, INC., MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION. (Lueken, John)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Appoint Receiver, filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Douglas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Appoint Receiver , filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian Rose)(Bates, Douglas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Receiver , filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bates, Douglas)
October 8, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WESBANCO BANK, INC.. BYRON S. EVANCZYK served on 10/5/2018. (Stanley, Chelsea)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WESBANCO BANK, INC.. DAVID A. EVANCZYK served on 10/4/2018. (Stanley, Chelsea)
October 8, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WESBANCO BANK, INC.. DAVID W. EVANCZYK served on 10/4/2018. (Stanley, Chelsea)
October 8, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WESBANCO BANK, INC.. MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION served on 10/4/2018. (Stanley, Chelsea)
October 8, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WESBANCO BANK, INC.. MARINE BUILDERS, INC. served on 10/4/2018. (Stanley, Chelsea)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WESBANCO BANK, INC. identifying Corporate Parent WesBanco, Inc. for WESBANCO BANK, INC... (Bates, Douglas)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BYRON S. EVANCZYK, DAVID W. EVANCZYK, DAVID A. EVANCZYK, JENNY LYNNE, MARINE BUILDERS, INC., MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION. (MAT)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Bates, Douglas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea R. Stanley on behalf of Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Stanley, Chelsea)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William Robert Meyer, II on behalf of Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Meyer, William)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas B. Bates on behalf of Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Bates, Douglas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Submission of Index of Exhibits as attachment to Complaint, filed by Plaintiff WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Bates, Douglas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JENNY LYNNE, MARINE BUILDERS, INC., MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION, BYRON S. EVANCZYK, DAVID A. EVANCZYK, and DAVID W. EVANCZYK,filed by WESBANCO BANK, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5091776) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Marine Industries Note, #2 Exhibit B. Marine Industries Commercial Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C. Marine Industries UCC Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit D. Marine Industries Allonge, #5 Exhibit F. Marine Industries Business Loan Agreement, #6 Exhibit G. Marine Industries Notice of Default, #7 Exhibit H. Marine Industries Payoff Quote, #8 Exhibit I. Marine Builders Business Loan Agreement, #9 Exhibit J. Marine Builders Note, #10 Exhibit K. Marine Builders Allonge, #11 Exhibit L. Marine Builders First Preferred Ship Mortgage, #12 Exhibit M. Marine Builders Commercial Security Agreement, #13 Exhibit N. Abstract of Title, #14 Exhibit O. Marine Builders UCC Financing Statement, #15 Exhibit P. Byron S. Evanczyk Guarantee, #16 Exhibit Q. David A. Evanczyk Guarantee, #17 Exhibit R. David W. Evanczyk Guarantee, #18 Exhibit S. Marine Builders Notice of Default, #19 Exhibit T. Marine Builders Payoff Quote, #20 Proposed Summons JennyLynne, #21 Proposed Summons Marine Builders, Inc., #22 Proposed Summons Marine Industries Corporation, #23 Proposed Summons Byron S. Evanczyk, #24 Proposed Summons David A. Evanczyk, #25 Proposed Summons David W. Evanczyk, #26 USM 285 Form)(Bates, Douglas) Modified on 10/3/2018 to correct docket text (MAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESBANCO BANK, INC. v. JENNY LYNNE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESBANCO BANK, INC.
Represented By: Chelsea R. Stanley
Represented By: William Robert Meyer, II
Represented By: Douglas B. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A. EVANCZYK
Represented By: Christopher B. Madden
Represented By: John S. Lueken
Represented By: James R. Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYRON S. EVANCZYK
Represented By: Christopher B. Madden
Represented By: John S. Lueken
Represented By: James R. Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE INDUSTRIES CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher B. Madden
Represented By: John S. Lueken
Represented By: James R. Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID W. EVANCZYK
Represented By: Christopher B. Madden
Represented By: John S. Lueken
Represented By: James R. Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE BUILDERS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher B. Madden
Represented By: John S. Lueken
Represented By: James R. Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNY LYNNE
Represented By: Christopher B. Madden
Represented By: John S. Lueken
Represented By: James R. Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?