MILLER v. MILLIS TRANSFER, INC. et al

Plaintiff: MARVIN MILLER
Defendant: MILLIS TRANSFER, INC. and DARRYL J WILLIAMS
Case Number: 4:2018cv00195
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 CLOSED DISMISSED - with prejudice, costs paid. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/17/2018. (MAT)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara Wells Stigger on behalf of Plaintiff MARVIN MILLER. (Stigger, Cara)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal , filed by Plaintiff MARVIN MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Stigger, Cara)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Emily Marie Gettum hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Gettum, Emily)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal - The court has been notified that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty days of the date of this entry, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Additional time to complete the execution of the settlement documents may be granted if requested in writing before expiration of this period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/21/2018. (MAT)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement, filed by Defendants MILLIS TRANSFER, INC., DARRYL J WILLIAMS (Whitten, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Marie Gettum on behalf of Defendants MILLIS TRANSFER, INC., DARRYL J WILLIAMS. (Gettum, Emily)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MILLIS TRANSFER, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants MILLIS TRANSFER, INC., DARRYL J WILLIAMS. (Whitten, Christopher)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 RECEIPT #IP062586 for filing fee in the amount of $400.00, paid by Christopher Whitten. (DJH)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dearborn County Superior Court, case number 15D02-1808-CT-000022, filed by All Defendants. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Request for Admissions, #2 Exhibit State Court Record (Complaint, Summons, Appearance for Defendants, Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to Complaint, Order on Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, SOS Affidavits of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. MILLIS TRANSFER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVIN MILLER
Represented By: Kerstin Ann Schuhmann
Represented By: Cara Wells Stigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLIS TRANSFER, INC.
Represented By: Emily Marie Gettum
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARRYL J WILLIAMS
Represented By: Emily Marie Gettum
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?