URSO v. AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY
Plaintiff: DONNA LYN URSO
Defendant: AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY
Case Number: 4:2018cv00223
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/30/2019.(MAT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Herre on behalf of Defendant AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY. (Herre, Robert)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY.(Herre, Robert)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Conrad S.P. Williams, III for DONNA LYN URSO added. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/25/2019. Copy sent to Conrad S.P. Williams III via US Mail. (MAT)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jessica L. Ibert for DONNA LYN URSO added. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/25/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (MAT) Modified on 1/25/2019 to correct docket text (MAT).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow for DONNA LYN URSO added. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/25/2019. Copy sent to Paul M. Sterbcow via US Mail. (MAT)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Conrad S.P. Williams, III to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5249611), filed by Plaintiff DONNA LYN URSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ludlow, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica L. Ibert to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5249596), filed by Plaintiff DONNA LYN URSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ludlow, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul M. Sterbcow to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5249543), filed by Plaintiff DONNA LYN URSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ludlow, James)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by DONNA LYN URSO. AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY waiver sent on 12/3/2018. (Ludlow, James)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service for Summons Supplied by DONNA LYN URSO. (Ludlow, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Ludlow on behalf of Plaintiff DONNA LYN URSO. (Ludlow, James)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damges against AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY, filed by DONNA LYN URSO. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5180498) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ludlow, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: URSO v. AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA LYN URSO
Represented By: James F. Ludlow
Represented By: Jessica L. Ibert
Represented By: Conrad S.P. Williams, III
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN QUEEN STEAMBOAT OPERATING COMPANY
Represented By: Robert P. Herre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?