BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. CSI TRUCKING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.
Defendant: CSI TRUCKING, LLC and WILLIAM GREEN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/25/2019. (MAT)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. WILLIAM GREEN served on 1/9/2019. (Haney, James)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. CSI TRUCKING, LLC served on 1/9/2019. (Haney, James)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to 3/18/2019 to answer Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/17/2019. (MAT)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Submission of Proposed Order , re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/16/2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants CSI TRUCKING, LLC, WILLIAM GREEN. (Holland, Douglas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Order , re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/16/2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants CSI TRUCKING, LLC, WILLIAM GREEN. (Holland, Douglas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/16/2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants CSI TRUCKING, LLC, WILLIAM GREEN. (Holland, Douglas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Holland on behalf of Defendants CSI TRUCKING, LLC, WILLIAM GREEN. (Holland, Douglas)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO FINANCIAL GROUP for BMO HARRIS BANK N.A... (Haney, James)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (LAB) (LBT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James K. Haney on behalf of Plaintiff BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Haney, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSI TRUCKING, LLC and WILLIAM GREEN. (LBT)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSI TRUCKING, LLC, WILLIAM GREEN, filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5221075) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loan and Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Modification Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Loan and Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Modification Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Continuing Guaranty, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Haney, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. CSI TRUCKING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSI TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By: Douglas C. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GREEN
Represented By: Douglas C. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.
Represented By: James K. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?