HUFF v. HURLEY, et al

Plaintiff: Shellie Huff
Defendant: Marion Hurley and A & R Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00030
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/22/2019. (MAT)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED - Parties appeared by counsel on 3/14/2019 for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2020. Discovery due by 12/18/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/14/2019. (MAT)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on March 14, 2019, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on June 12, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT, filed by Plaintiff SHELLIE HUFF. (Weathers, Scott)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants A & R LOGISTICS, INC., MARION HURLEY . (Langford, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Bonnie Clay on behalf of Plaintiff SHELLIE HUFF. (Clay, Caroline)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time), before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/22/2019. (MAT)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by A & R LOGISTICS, INC., MARION HURLEY.(Langford, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A & R Logistics, Inc.. (Langford, Michael)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Langford on behalf of Defendants A & R Logistics, Inc., Marion Hurley. (Langford, Michael)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark Circuit Court, case number 10C01-1901-CT-000019, filed by A & R Logistics, Inc., Marion Hurley. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5291100) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langford, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUFF v. HURLEY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Hurley
Represented By: Michael Brian Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & R Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shellie Huff
Represented By: Clarence Benjamin Leatherbury
Represented By: Caroline Bonnie Clay
Represented By: Scott A. Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?