AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. MCROY et al
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MIKO MCROY, BRITTANY JACKSON and ZACHARY KELLY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00035
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. ZACHARY KELLY served on 3/28/2019. (Smith, Audrey)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Alias Summons issued as to ZACHARY KELLY. (MAT)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to ZACHARY KELLY. (Smith, Audrey)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. BRITTANY JACKSON served on 3/5/2019. (Smith, Audrey)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Petition to Appoint Administrator, #2 Exhibit B - Order Appointing Administrator, #3 Exhibit C - Westfield Auto Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Westfield Umbrella Policy, #5 Exhibit E - Auto-Owners Policy, #6 Proposed Summons)(Taylor, David)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT - Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint curing the above deficiency within TWENTY-ONE DAYS from the date of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/28/2019. (MAT)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BRITTANY JACKSON, ZACHARY KELLY, MIKO MCROY. (MAT)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey L. Smith on behalf of Plaintiff AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Smith, Audrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Taylor, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Taylor on behalf of Plaintiff AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Taylor, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5299884) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Petition to Appoint Administrator, #2 Exhibit B - Order Appointing Administrator, #3 Exhibit C - Westfield Auto Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Westfield Umbrella Policy, #5 Exhibit E - Auto-Owners Policy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Taylor, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY v. MCROY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKO MCROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Audrey L. Smith
Represented By: David L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?