WATSON v. ACBL TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, LLC

Plaintiff: CURTIS WATSON
Defendant: ACBL TRANSPORTATION SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00120
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-14062. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AND REASONS: For the foregoing reasons set forth in the document, defendant's #6 motion to transfer venue is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, New Albany Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/5/2019.(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial (3 to 4 days) set for 4/20/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 3/3/2020.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jjs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 Supplemental Memorandum filed by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant To F.R.C.P.12(b)(3), Or In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/9/2019. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P.12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue re: rec. doc. 6 by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A)(Guichard, Lauren) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (mm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2019 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/19/19.(jjs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/14/2019.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/14/2019. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant To F.R.C.P.12(b)(3), Or In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/13/2019. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), or In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue, Rec. Doc. 6 by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Guichard, Lauren) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Curtis Watson regarding #11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Vourvoulias, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Curtis Watson re #11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, #10 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, Rec. Doc. 6 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis M. O'Bryan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, Rec. Doc. 6 by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Guichard, Lauren) Modified text on 3/13/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, Rec. Doc. 6 by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Guichard, Lauren) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Curtis Watson re #6 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant To F.R.C.P.12(b)(3), Or In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis M. O'Bryan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant To F.R.C.P.12(b)(3), Or In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Notice of Submission, #7 Proposed Order)Attorney Lauren A. Guichard added to party ACBL Transportation Services, LLC(pty:dft).(Guichard, Lauren) Modified submission date on 2/22/2019 (jls). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dennis M. O'Bryan. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 01/09/2019. (am) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2019: #1 Pro Hac Vice Notice) (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dennis M. O'Bryan (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7346017) by Curtis Watson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Vourvoulias, George) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACBL Transportation Services, LLC. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Curtis Watson (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7316792) filed by Curtis Watson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney George P. Vourvoulias, III added to party Curtis Watson(pty:pla).(Vourvoulias, George) Modified text on 12/21/2018 (sbs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATSON v. ACBL TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACBL TRANSPORTATION SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Lauren A. Guichard
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Represented By: Danica B. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS WATSON
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: George P. Vourvoulias, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?