GROVE v. JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Plaintiff: LONI GROVE
Defendant: JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 4:2019cv00148
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND DISCUSSING DISCOVERY IN PRISONER LITIGATION: This Order sets the schedule for how this action shall proceed. Part I sets forth the pretrial deadlines. Part II discusses various aspects of discovery. Facilitating the discovery process can be difficult, and this Order is issued in an effort to help explain and streamline the process for the parties. The parties should carefully read this Order. *SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*. Dispositive Motions due by 4/6/2020. Discovery due by 3/4/2020. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/3/2019.(TMC)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT.(Schneeman, Pamela)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial (Automatic) Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT (Schneeman, Pamela)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Schneeman, Pamela)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela G. Schneeman on behalf of Defendant JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Schneeman, Pamela)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Stephenson on behalf of Defendant JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Stephenson, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by LONI GROVE. JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT served on 7/12/2019. (Falk, Kenneth)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Screening Complaint - The Court has screened the complaint. It shall proceed as presented. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/12/2019. (DMW)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (LBT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Falk on behalf of Plaintiff LONI GROVE. (Falk, Kenneth)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, filed by LONI GROVE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5518880) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Falk, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GROVE v. JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONI GROVE
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Pamela G. Schneeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?