BONDS v. RISING STAR CASINO RESORT. et al
Plaintiff: TODD BONDS
Defendant: FULL HOUSE RESORTS, BEN DOUGLASS, ANGI TRUEBNER-WEBB, RISING STAR CASINO RESORT, INDIANA GAMING COMMISSION, ENFORCEMENT AGENTS, UNIDENTIFIED WHITE MALE BUFFET WORKER 1, UNIDENTIFIED WHITE FEMALE BUFFET WORKER 2, UNIDENTIFIED WHITE FEMALE BUFFET WORKER and RYAN HARTNETT
Case Number: 4:2019cv00151
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RISING STAR CASINO RESORT & FULL HOUSE RESORTS identifying FULL HOUSE RESORTS as corporate parent of RISING STAR CASINO RESORT. (McDermott, Dorothy) Modified on 8/23/2019 to correct docket text(TMC).
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RISING STAR CASINO RESORT, RYAN HARTNETT, FULL HOUSE RESORTS. RISING STAR CASINO RESORT waiver sent on 7/17/2019; RYAN HARTNETT waiver sent on 7/17/2019; FULL HOUSE RESORTS waiver sent on 7/17/2019. (McDermott, Dorothy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendants FULL HOUSE RESORTS, RYAN HARTNETT, RISING STAR CASINO RESORT. (Mohler, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorothy D. McDermott on behalf of Defendants FULL HOUSE RESORTS, RYAN HARTNETT, RISING STAR CASINO RESORT. (McDermott, Dorothy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk to: Rising Star Casino Resort, Ryan Hartnett, and Full House Resorts. (NAD) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/17/2019) (NAD).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS Mr. Bonds' Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. #2 The Court DISMISSES Mr. Bonds' claims against Ben Douglass, the unidentified buffet workers, Indiana Gaming Commission Enforcement Agents, and Angi Truebner-Webb. Mr. Bonds' race and religious discrimination claims under Title II of the Civil Rights Act against Rising Star Casino Resort and Full House Resorts may proceed. Mr. Bonds' race discrimination claims under 1981 against Ryan Hartnett, Rising Star Casino Resort, and Full House Resorts may proceed. Accordingly, the Clerk is ordered pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) to issue process to Ryan Hartnett, Rising Star Casino Resort, and Full House Resorts in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the Complaint, [Filing No. #1 ], applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. (See Entry.) Copies per distribution list via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/17/2019. (NAD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TODD BONDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BEN DOUGLASS, FULL HOUSE RESORTS, RYAN HARTNETT, INDIANA GAMING COMMISSION, ENFORCEMENT AGENTS, RISING STAR CASINO RESORT, ANGI TRUEBNER-WEBB, UNIDENTIFIED WHITE FEMALE BUFFET WORKER, UNIDENTIFIED WHITE FEMALE BUFFET WORKER 2, UNIDENTIFIED WHITE MALE BUFFET WORKER 1, filed by TODD BONDS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Exclusion notice, #2 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BONDS v. RISING STAR CASINO RESORT. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULL HOUSE RESORTS
Represented By: Dorothy D. McDermott
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN DOUGLASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGI TRUEBNER-WEBB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RISING STAR CASINO RESORT
Represented By: Dorothy D. McDermott
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA GAMING COMMISSION, ENFORCEMENT AGENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIDENTIFIED WHITE MALE BUFFET WORKER 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIDENTIFIED WHITE FEMALE BUFFET WORKER 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIDENTIFIED WHITE FEMALE BUFFET WORKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN HARTNETT
Represented By: Dorothy D. McDermott
Represented By: Michael Carl Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD BONDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?