HAINES v. FREEMAN et al
Plaintiff: JAREL T. HAINES
Defendant: MATT FLETCHER, JASON BLITON, JENNINGS COUNTY JAIL, EVAN PONSLER, GREEN, EVERMON, LABIAK and KENNY FREEMAN
Case Number: 4:2019cv00165
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 Submission of Subpoena, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Envelope)(TMC)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying as Moot Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - The motion contains the names of minor children which, under Rule 5.2(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, should have been identified by their initials. Consequently, the clerk is directed to place the motion, dkt. #16 , under seal. #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. See order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/13/2019 (copy mailed to plaintiff). (LBT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 **SEALED PER NO. 17** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC) Modified on 9/13/2019 (LBT).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Because the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis, his motion for extension of time, dkt. #12 , is denied as moot. Similarly, his motion to subpoena inmate trust fund records, dkt. #14 , is denied as moot. #5 Motion for Subpoenas is granted. The clerk is directed to send three endorsed but otherwise blank subpoenas to the plaintiff along with his copy of this Order. It is the plaintiff's responsibility to serve the subpoenas on the appropriate persons (see order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/11/2019 (copies mailed to Jarel Haines). (TMC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to: Subpoena; Inmate Trust Fund Records, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #2 Attachment) (TMC).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with #9 Notice of Deficiency is GRANTED to the extent the plaintiff shall have through 9/30/2019, to submit a copy of the transaction history associated with his institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action on 7/29/2019. The clerk is directed to include a blank copy of the form motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with the plaintiff's copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/3/2019(copy mailed to Jarel Haines). (TMC)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Notice of Deficiency, #2 Envelope) (CKM)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with #9 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(LBT)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail) (JRT)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through September 18, 2019, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail) (JRT)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of Additional Claims, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Historical and Statutory Notes, #3 Envelope)(NAD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Subpoenas, filed by Plaintiff JAREL T. HAINES. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Caren L. Pollack on behalf of Defendants JASON BLITON, EVERMON, MATT FLETCHER, KENNY FREEMAN, GREEN, JENNINGS COUNTY JAIL, EVAN PONSLER. (Pollack, Caren)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through September 5, 2019 in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). (Copy to plaintiff by US Mail) (MEH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JASON BLITON, EVERMON, MATT FLETCHER, KENNY FREEMAN, GREEN, JENNINGS COUNTY JAIL, LABIAK, EVAN PONSLER, filed by JAREL T. HAINES. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAINES v. FREEMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAREL T. HAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT FLETCHER
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON BLITON
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNINGS COUNTY JAIL
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVAN PONSLER
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERMON
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNY FREEMAN
Represented By: Caren L. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?