MCPHERSON v. WAL-MART, INC.
Plaintiff: WAL-MART, INC. and BONITA MCPHERSON
Defendant: WALMART INC.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00179
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant WALMART INC. . (Lamb, Emily)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COURT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, filed by Plaintiff BONITA MCPHERSON (Callahan, John)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Continuance. The initial pretrial conference set for 10/21/2019 at 2:00 p.m. EST is rescheduled for 10/31/2019, at 11:30 a.m. (Eastern) and will be held by telephone. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/4/2019. (TMC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Defendant WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Emily)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #224, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch (see order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/26/2019.(TMC)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff BONITA MCPHERSON. (Callahan, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Scott Callahan on behalf of Plaintiff BONITA MCPHERSON. (Callahan, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kincaid Adams on behalf of Defendant WAL-MART, INC. (Adams, Jennifer) Modified on 8/23/2019 to correct typo (TMC).
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART, INC.. (Lamb, Emily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily C. Lamb on behalf of Defendant WAL-MART, INC. (Lamb, Emily) Modified on 8/23/2019 to correct typo (TMC).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson Superior Court, case number 36D01-1907-CT-000032, filed by WAL-MART, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5593694) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Emails, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamb, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCPHERSON v. WAL-MART, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAL-MART, INC.
Represented By: Emily C. Lamb
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONITA MCPHERSON
Represented By: John Scott Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC.
Represented By: Emily C. Lamb
Represented By: Jennifer Kincaid Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?