WATERS v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.
Plaintiff: JEANETTE WATERS
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00186
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JEANETTE WATERS . (Logan, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P..(Zoeller, Susan)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/26/2019.(LBT)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.. (Zoeller, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent WALMART INC., Other Affiliate WSE MANAGEMENT LLC, Other Affiliate WSE INVESTMENT LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East LLC for WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P... (Zoeller, Susan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A. Ahonen on behalf of Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.. (Ahonen, Zachary)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Zoeller on behalf of Defendant WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.. (Zoeller, Susan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service, filed by JEANETTE WATERS. WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. served on 9/9/2019. (Haskin, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P. (TMC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Logan on behalf of Plaintiff JEANETTE WATERS. (Logan, Paul)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff JEANETTE WATERS. (Haskin, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P., filed by JEANETTE WATERS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5611808) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATERS v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE WATERS
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Represented By: Paul Anthony Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.
Represented By: Zachary A. Ahonen
Represented By: Susan M. Zoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?