COOMER v. POYNTER et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL AARON COOMER
Defendant: CHRIS EVERHART, ANN MORRIS, JOHN ROCHE, RICHARD POYNTER and RICHARD MEYER
Case Number: 4:2019cv00247
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #17 Entry sent to DANIEL AARON COOMER Jackson County Jail 150 E. State Rd. 250 Brownstown, IN 47220. Return to sender - released. (TMC)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #15 Order sent to DANIEL AARON COOMER Jackson County Jail 150 E. State Rd. 250 Brownstown, IN 47220. Return to sender - released. (TMC)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #10 Scheduling Order sent to DANIEL AARON COOMER c/o Jackson County Jail 150 E. State Rd. 250 Brownstown, IN 47220. Return to sender - not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (TMC)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 Entry Directing Development of Exhaustion Defense and Issuing Partial Stay - The defendants shall have through 2/3/2020 to respond. If a dispositive motion is filed, the plaintiff shall have twenty-eight (28) days in which to respond. The defendants shall then have fourteen (14) days in which to reply. Except for activities associated with the development and resolution of the defendants' affirmative defense that the plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies prior to filing this action, or any other matter directed by the Court, any other activities or deadlines in the action are stayed. Discovery on the issue of exhaustion is allowed (See Entry). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/23/2019 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by CHRIS EVERHART, RICHARD MEYER, ANN MORRIS.(Lowe, R.)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO REPORT CURRENT ADDRESS - The plaintiff shall have through 1/17/2020, in which to report his current address in writing. If he does not report a current address by that time, the Court will presume that he has abandoned this action, which will result in the dismissal of the action without further notice for failure to prosecute (See Order). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/20/2019 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #9 Entry #8 Order sent to DANIEL AARON COOMER Jackson County Jail 150 E. State Rd. 250 Brownstown, IN 47220. Return to sender - attempted, not known, unable to forward. (TMC)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #7 Notice to Pro se Litigant sent to DANIEL AARON COOMER. (Return to Sender ) (CKM)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Scheduling Order, #5 Order to Produce Inmate sent to DANIEL AARON COOMER JACKSON COUNTY JAIL 150 E. STATE ROAD 250 BROWNSTOWN, IN 47220. Return to sender - not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (TMC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal, #8 Order by CHRIS EVERHART, RICHARD MEYER, ANN MORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Operative Complaint)(Lowe, R.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Vacating Initial Pretrial Conference - The January 7, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/6/2019 (Copies mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 Entry Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The summary of remaining claims above includes all the viable claims identified by the Court. All other claims have been dismissed. If the plaintiff believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court, he shall have through 12/31/2019, in which to identify those claims or seek leave to file an amended complaint. Because all claims against them have been dismissed, the clerk is directed to terminate Richard Poynter and John Roche as defendants on the docket. The defendants Everhart, Meyer, and Morris have already appeared. They shall have through 12/20/2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. RICHARD POYNTER and JOHN ROCHE terminated (See Entry). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/6/2019 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Defendants removed this matter on 11/21/2019. Defendants failed, however, to "file an additional copy of the operative complaint as a separate attachment to the Notice of Removal," as required by Local Rule 81-2(c). The Court therefore ORDERS Defendants to file an additional copy of the operative complaint on or before 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 12/6/2019 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by US Mail. (MEH)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Removal Notice by CHRIS EVERHART, RICHARD MEYER, ANN MORRIS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to Plaintiff and Clerk of Jackson and Superior Court Number One of Defendants' Application to Remove Cause to Federal Court) (Lowe, R.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to PRODUCE INMATE. Warden of Jackson County Jail ordered to produce Daniel Aaron Coomer for a telephonic initial pretrial conference on 1/7/2020 at 10:30a.m. (Eastern) (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/25/2019 (Copies mailed per distribution list). Electronic notice to USM-C.(TMC)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/25/2019 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Jeffrey Lowe on behalf of Defendants CHRIS EVERHART, RICHARD MEYER, ANN MORRIS. (Lowe, R.)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson Superior Court No. 1, case number 36D01-1910-CT-44, filed by ANN MORRIS, CHRIS EVERHART, RICHARD MEYER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5734314) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record (Complaint, Motion for Fee Waiver, Proposed Order Granting Fee Waiver, Summons filed for All Defendants, Return of Service for All Defendants, Motion to File Tentative Trial Date, Motion for Orders to Issue Subpoenas, Notice Filed by Plaintiff on October 28, 2019, Motion for Default Judgment filed November 12, 2019, Appearance of Counsel for Richard Poynter, Answer and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Richard Poynter, Appearance of Undersigned for Meyer and Morris, Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Meyer and Morris, Proposed Order Granting Enlargement filed by Meyer and Morris, Appearance of Undersigned for Everhart, Motion for Enlargement of Time filed by Everhart, Proposed Order Granting Enlargement of Time filed by Everhart, Appearance of John Roche, Answer to the Plaintiff's Complaint by John Roche, Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference, Notice to Plaintiff and Clerk of the Jackson Superior Court of Defendant's Application to Remove Cause to Federal Court and Notice of Filing Removal Notice in the Jackson Superior Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Correspondence with Counsel for Defendant Poytner, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence with Defendant Roche, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowe, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOMER v. POYNTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS EVERHART
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN MORRIS
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROCHE
Represented By: John Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD POYNTER
Represented By: Ilene M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD MEYER
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL AARON COOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?