BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. SCOTT COUNTY RESTAURANTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, a division of LIGHTHOUSE, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC and ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC
Defendant: SCOTT COUNTY RESTAURANTS, INC. d/b/a BONANZA STEAK & BBQ, MICHAEL P. EVERHART and SCOTT COUNTY RESTAURANTS, INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00006
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME, filed by Plaintiffs BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC. (Wimberg, April)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) Copy mailed to Register of Copyrights (TMC) Modified on 1/13/2020 to reflect copy mailed (TMC).
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC identifying Corporate Parent LIGHTHOUSE, INC.(Wimberg, April) Modified on 1/13/2020 to correct docket text (TMC).
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by April Wimberg on behalf of Plaintiffs BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.. (Wimberg, April)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL P. EVERHART, SCOTT COUNTY RESTAURANTS, INC. (TMC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC. (LAB) (TMC)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, a division of LIGHTHOUSE, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC. identifying Corporate Parent BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. for BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, a division of LIGHTHOUSE, INC., EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC... (Wimberg, April)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5801427) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Scott County Restaurants, Inc. dba Bonanza Steak & BBQ, #4 Proposed Summons Michael P. Everhart)(Wimberg, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. SCOTT COUNTY RESTAURANTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC, a division of LIGHTHOUSE, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMBINE MUSIC CORP.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC. d/b/a EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNICHAPPELL MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIJAH BLUE MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT COUNTY RESTAURANTS, INC. d/b/a BONANZA STEAK & BBQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL P. EVERHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT COUNTY RESTAURANTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?