GREEN v. YAVRUYAN et al
Plaintiff: EDDIE M. GREEN, JR.
Defendant: ARA YAVRUYAN and CHAIN VAULT INC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00052
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff EDDIE M. GREEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Documents for service by USM - re #9 Summons Issued, #8 Documents for Service by USM #1 Complaint. Electronic notice to USM-C.(TMC) Modified on 4/1/2020 to correct docket text (TMC).
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued by Clerk as to CHAIN VAULT INC, ARA YAVRUYAN. (Attachments: #1 USM 285, #2 USM 285)(TMC). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/1/2020) (TMC). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/1/2020) (TMC).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order - #3 Motion for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel is denied without prejudice. The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(2), to issue process to defendants Ara Yavruyan and Chain Vault, Inc. Process shall consist of a summons. The Marshal for this District or his Deputy shall serve the summons, together with a copy of the complaint, filed on March 2, 2020, and a copy of this Entry, on the defendants at the expense of the United States. Service may be made by certified mail. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e)(1) and 4(h)(1)(A).. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/31/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). Electronic Notice to USM.(TMC)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIPT #NA004233 for filing fee in the amount of $400.00, paid by Eddie Green. (LBT)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the $400.00 filing fee. No further action will be taken on this patent infringement matter until the filing fee has been paid (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/9/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (TMC)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff EDDIE M. GREEN, JR. (TMC)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff EDDIE M. GREEN, JR. (TMC)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHAIN VAULT INC, ARA YAVRUYAN, filed by EDDIE M. GREEN, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (TMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. YAVRUYAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE M. GREEN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARA YAVRUYAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAIN VAULT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?