REYNOLDS v. LEWIS et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Reynolds
Defendant: RONALD J LEWIS, EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC. and RONALD LEWIS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00077
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2021. Non-expert witness and liability discovery due by 2/2/2021. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/22/2020.(LBT)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel appeared for an initial pretrial conference on May 22, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on August 21, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC., RONALD LEWIS . (Hearn, Edward)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.. (Hearn, Edward)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 2:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/28/2020.(TMC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC. (LAB) (TMC)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC., RONALD LEWIS.(Hearn, Edward)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal State Court Docket by EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC., RONALD LEWIS. (Hearn, Edward)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Statement Responding to the Allegations of the Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Foushee, Nathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Foushee on behalf of Plaintiff BRANDON REYNOLDS. (Foushee, Nathan)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thel Matthew Frost on behalf of Defendants EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC., RONALD J LEWIS. (Frost, Thel)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Hearn on behalf of Defendants EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC., RONALD J LEWIS. (Hearn, Edward)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson Superior Court 1, case number 36D01-2002-CT-000024, filed by RONALD J LEWIS, EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5938018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hearn, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REYNOLDS v. LEWIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD J LEWIS
Represented By: Thel Matthew Frost
Represented By: Edward W. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUITY TRANSPORTATION CO., INC.
Represented By: Thel Matthew Frost
Represented By: Edward W. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD LEWIS
Represented By: Thel Matthew Frost
Represented By: Edward W. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Reynolds
Represented By: Nathan D. Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?