STIVERS v. INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC a/k/a POLYCOR INC.
Plaintiff: JOSHUA L. STIVERS
Defendant: INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC a/k/a POLYCOR INC.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00124
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC.(Shelby, Amanda)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC . (Shelby, Amanda)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff JOSHUA L. STIVERS, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff JOSHUA L. STIVERS. (Kondras, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff JOSHUA L. STIVERS. (Kondras, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 1:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/2/2020.(TMC)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC. (Shelby, Amanda)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Edward Preller on behalf of Defendant INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC. (Preller, Alexander)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L. Shelby on behalf of Defendant INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC. (Shelby, Amanda)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by JOSHUA L. STIVERS. INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC served on 6/15/2020. (Kondras, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff JOSHUA L. STIVERS. (Kondras, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued by Clerk as to INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC. (TMC)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC, filed by JOSHUA L. STIVERS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6020766) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) Modified on 6/8/2020 to edit text (TMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STIVERS v. INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC a/k/a POLYCOR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA LIMESTONE ACQUISITION, LLC a/k/a POLYCOR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA L. STIVERS
Represented By: Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?