JONES v. JOSH
Plaintiff: FREDERICK D. JONES, JR.
Defendant: JOSH
Case Number: 4:2020cv00134
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with court order. Plaintiff is ordered to redact the confidential information and re-file the Complaint within fourteen days of this notice (See Order). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/29/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Clerk is directed to restrict Dkt. #1 temporarily to case participants only. Plaintiff is given leave to redact the confidential information and re-file the Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of this notice. If a redacted version is not filed within twenty-one days, the case participants restriction will be removed (See Order). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/29/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he is financially unable to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Should Plaintiff move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, we direct him to utilize this Courts in forma pauperis form affidavit, which is attached to this Order. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/23/2020 (Copies mailed per distribution list). (Attachments: #1 Blank Form)(TMC)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOSH, filed by FREDERICK D. JONES, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) Modified on 6/24/2020 to seal (TMC). Modified on 6/30/2020 to edit restrictions (TMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. JOSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK D. JONES, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?