BURTON v. NOEL et al
Plaintiff: RODERICK BURTON
Defendant: SHERIFF JAMEY NOEL, JAMES VEALS and JAMEY NOEL
Case Number: 4:2020cv00161
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey C. Stansbury on behalf of Defendant JAMES VEALS. (Stansbury, Casey)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Matthew Graham on behalf of Defendant JAMES VEALS. (Graham, Curtis)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/9/2020.(TMC)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by JAMES VEALS.(Lowe, R.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by JAMEY NOEL.(Lowe, R.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants JAMEY NOEL, JAMES VEALS. (Lowe, R.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Jeffrey Lowe on behalf of Defendants JAMEY NOEL, JAMES VEALS. (Lowe, R.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Garry R. Adams hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Adams, Garry)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued by Clerk as to JAMEY NOEL, JAMES VEALS. (TMC)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Garry R. Adams on behalf of Plaintiff RODERICK BURTON. (Adams, Garry)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RODERICK BURTON, filed by RODERICK BURTON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6081829) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Adams, Garry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURTON v. NOEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF JAMEY NOEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES VEALS
Represented By: Casey C. Stansbury
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: Curtis Matthew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMEY NOEL
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK BURTON
Represented By: Garry R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?