AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC v. ESPY SERVICES INC.
Plaintiff: AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC
Defendant: ESPY SERVICES INC.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00180
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:4
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/23/2020 to file response to Petition to Compel Arbitration and Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/14/2020. (TMC)
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 Submission of Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Response and Case Management Order, re #20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/23/2020 in which to #1 Complaint, #4 Brief/Memorandum in Support Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Filoe Respondents Re3sponse and Case Management Order, filed by Defendant ESPY SERVICES INC.. (Koch, Eric)
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 Agreed Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/23/2020 to file response re #1 Complaint/Petition to Compel Arbitration and file Case Management Plan, filed by Defendant ESPY SERVICES INC. (Koch, Eric) Modified on 10/13/2020 to correct event selection and edit document title (TMC).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/22/2020.(TMC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 Submission of Signature Requirement re #17 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to 10/12/2020 to respond to Petition to Compel Compel Arbitration by ESPY SERVICES INC.. (Bailey, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to 10/12/2020 to respond to Petition to Compel Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant ESPY SERVICES INC. (Koch, Eric) Modified on 9/21/2020 (JDH).
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Allan Koch on behalf of Defendant ESPY SERVICES INC.. (Koch, Eric)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESPY SERVICES INC.. (Bailey, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Bailey on behalf of Defendant ESPY SERVICES INC.. (Bailey, Brian)
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. ESPY SERVICES INC. served on 8/19/2020 (Gjerdingen, Erick) Modified on 9/9/2020 to add party name (TMC).
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (TMC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 Submission of Signature Requirement re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Grodner, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Submission of Signature Requirement re #4 Brief/Memorandum in Support by AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Grodner, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Submission of Signature Requirement re #1 Complaint by AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Grodner, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Mitchell Grodner on behalf of Plaintiff AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Grodner, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ESPY SERVICES INC. (TMC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration, re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Gjerdingen, Erick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Gjerdingen, Erick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erick Thomas Gjerdingen on behalf of Plaintiff AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Gjerdingen, Erick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT/Petition to Compel Arbitration against ESPY SERVICES INC., filed by AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6135997) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Gjerdingen, Erick) Modified on 8/18/2020 (REO). Modified on 10/13/2020 to edit document title (TMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC v. ESPY SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN HEALTH ASSOCIATION, LLC
Represented By: Erick Thomas Gjerdingen
Represented By: Geoffrey Mitchell Grodner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESPY SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Eric Allan Koch
Represented By: Brian Edward Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?