PARTIN v. BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM R. PARTIN
Defendant: BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. d/b/a BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD, DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER and BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD
Case Number: 4:2020cv00185
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 dd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff WILLIAM R. PARTIN . (Merrick, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Scott, Rodney)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 Alias Summons Issued by Clerk as to DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER. (TMC) Modified on 9/29/2020 to edit document title (TMC).
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER. (Merrick, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/22/2020.(TMC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC.. (Scott, Rodney)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. (RAGS) (TMC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - INCORRECT FILING***NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. (RAGS) (TMC) Modified on 9/21/2020 to reflect incorrect filing (TMC).
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robert Hofmann on behalf of Defendants BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER. (Hofmann, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER. (Scott, Rodney)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Lee Scott on behalf of Defendants BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER. (Scott, Rodney)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Merrick on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM R. PARTIN. (Merrick, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued by Clerk as to BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER. (TMC)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER filed by WILLIAM R. PARTIN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6142793) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit Termination Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Multiple Defendants)(Merrick, Michael) Modified on 8/24/2020 to add party names (TMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARTIN v. BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. d/b/a BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL J. EICHENBERGER
Represented By: John Robert Hofmann
Represented By: Rodney Lee Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAPTIST HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. doing business as BAPTIST HEALTH FLOYD
Represented By: John Robert Hofmann
Represented By: Rodney Lee Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM R. PARTIN
Represented By: Michael C. Merrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?