STAFFORD v. SPEEDWAY, LLC
Plaintiff: GARY STAFFORD
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00190
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #224, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2021 at 9:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #200, United States Courthouse, 121 W. Spring Street, New Albany, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/30/2020.(TMC)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Regarding Discovery Disputes - Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1) and S.D. Ind. L.R. 37-1(a), counsel must confer in good faith to resolve a discovery dispute before involving the court in the dispute (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/30/2020.(TMC)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Parties appeared by counsel on 9/22/2020 for an initial pretrial conference. Discovery due by 6/30/2021 (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/29/2020.(TMC)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on September 22, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved. This case is set for a telephone status conference on January 29, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Allan Moeller on behalf of Plaintiff GARY STAFFORD. (Moeller, Chris)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC . (Davis, Thomas)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch - It is, therefore, ORDERED that this case be referred to the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge, The Honorable Debra McVicker Lynch, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. PLEASE USE ALTERED CASE NO. 4:20-cv-190-DML-TWP ON ALL FUTURE FILINGS WITH THIS COURT. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/8/2020.(TMC) Modified on 9/9/2020 to edit docket text (TMC).
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 1:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/1/2020.(TMC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Statement Responding to Removal by All Plaintiffs (Hurt, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Hurt on behalf of Plaintiff GARY STAFFORD. (Hurt, James)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Filing Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Record : State Court Docket Sheet; Complaint; Appearance (James Hurt); Summons; Returned Service; Appearance (Thomas L. Davis); Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas) Modified on 8/28/2020 to edit document title (TMC).
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPEEDWAY, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Other Affiliate MPC INVESTMENT LLC for SPEEDWAY, LLC.. (Davis, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Davis on behalf of Defendant SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Davis, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lawrence County Circuit Court, case number 47C01-2007-CT-000883, filed by SPEEDWAY, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6150336) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 State Court Record : State Court Docket Sheet; Complaint; Appearance (James Hurt); Summons; Returned Service; Appearance (Thomas L. Davis); Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STAFFORD v. SPEEDWAY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC
Represented By: Thomas L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY STAFFORD
Represented By: James R Hurt
Represented By: Chris Allan Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?