SANDCRAFT, LLC v. SUPER ATV, LLC
Plaintiff: SANDCRAFT LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as SANDCRAFT MOTORSPORTS and SANDCRAFT, LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as SANDCRAFT MOTORSPORTS
Defendant: SUPER ATV, LLC an Indiana limited liability company doing business as SUPERATV
Case Number: 4:2020cv00210
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/18/2020.(TMC)
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Collins on behalf of Defendant SUPER ATV, LLC. (Collins, Scott)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice is granted. Attorney Michael B. Dvoren for SANDCRAFT, LLC added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Michael B. Dvoren register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by November 30, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/16/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice is granted. Attorney Maria Crimi Speth added as to SANDCRAFT, LLC. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Maria Crimi Speth register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by November 26, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of her admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/12/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael B. Dvoren to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6271641), filed by Plaintiff SANDCRAFT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decl of Michael Dvoren, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodge, Reid)
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Maria Crimi Speth to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6270879), filed by Plaintiff SANDCRAFT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Maria Crimi Speth, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodge, Reid)
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Spiro Bereveskos on behalf of Defendant SUPER ATV, LLC. (Bereveskos, Spiro)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SANDCRAFT, LLC. SUPER ATV, LLC waiver sent on 10/14/2020. (McCoy, Andrew)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (TMC)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued by Clerk as to SUPER ATV, LLC. (TMC) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/13/2020) (TMC).
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Dodge on behalf of Plaintiff SANDCRAFT LLC. (Dodge, Reid)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis T. Perry on behalf of Plaintiff SANDCRAFT LLC. (Perry, Louis)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANDCRAFT LLC. (McCoy, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. McCoy on behalf of Plaintiff SANDCRAFT LLC. (McCoy, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against SUPER ATV, LLC, filed by SANDCRAFT LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6220618) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Pat 10,471,825, #2 Exhibit B - Photographs, #3 Exhibit C - Feb 26 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Claim Charts, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(McCoy, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANDCRAFT, LLC v. SUPER ATV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPER ATV, LLC an Indiana limited liability company doing business as SUPERATV
Represented By: Scott J. Collins
Represented By: Spiro Bereveskos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDCRAFT LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as SANDCRAFT MOTORSPORTS
Represented By: Andrew M. McCoy
Represented By: Reid Dodge
Represented By: Louis T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDCRAFT, LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as SANDCRAFT MOTORSPORTS
Represented By: Andrew M. McCoy
Represented By: Reid Dodge
Represented By: Louis T. Perry
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Represented By: Michael B. Dvoren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?