SHANKS v. CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF et al
Plaintiff: HOLLY SHANKS
Defendant: FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON, NATHAN WAYNE and CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF
Case Number: 4:2020cv00236
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/20/2021.(TMC)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Directing Development of Exhaustion Defense - The defendant's exhaustion defense will be resolved pursuant to the following schedule. The defendant shall have through February 24, 2021, in which to either: See Order. The failure to pursue any of these options by the above deadline constitutes an abandonment of the exhaustion defense (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/19/2021.(TMC)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF, NATHAN WAYNE.(Lowe, R.)
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint For Damages, filed by FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON.(McCall, William)
December 19, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by HOLLY SHANKS. CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF served on 11/30/2020. (Falk, Kenneth)
December 19, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by HOLLY SHANKS. NATHAN WAYNE served on 11/30/2020. (Falk, Kenneth)
December 19, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by HOLLY SHANKS. FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON served on 11/30/2020. (Falk, Kenneth)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Perry McCall, III on behalf of Defendant FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON. (McCall, William)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF, FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON, NATHAN WAYNE. (Lowe, R.)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Jeffrey Lowe on behalf of Defendants CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF, FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON, NATHAN WAYNE. (Lowe, R.)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Screening Order - Ms. Shanks' complaint shall proceed as pled (See Order). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/4/2020.(TMC) Modified on 12/7/2020 to edit text (TMC).
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued by Clerk as to CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF, FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON, NATHAN WAYNE. (TMC)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Falk on behalf of Plaintiff HOLLY SHANKS. (Falk, Kenneth)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by HOLLY SHANKS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6287728) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Falk, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHANKS v. CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORMER DEPUTY SHELTON
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Represented By: William Perry McCall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN WAYNE
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK COUNTY SHERIFF
Represented By: R. Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLY SHANKS
Represented By: Kenneth J. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?