ANDERSON v. SKELTON
Plaintiff: BRIAN ANDERSON
Defendant: PEGGY SKELTON and PEGGY Anderson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00034
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT, filed by Plaintiff BRIAN ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation Regarding Value of Case, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stanley, Chelsea)
April 8, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to PEGGY SKELTON. (TMC)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference - The court, on its own motion, VACATES the initial pretrial conference set for April 26, 2021, and RESETS it for May 5, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern). All other provisions of the court's Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference (Dkt. #8 remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/5/2021.(TMC)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND, filed by Defendant PEGGY SKELTON, re #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #9 MOTION to Remand . (Bartelt, Andrew)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas B. Bates on behalf of Plaintiff BRIAN ANDERSON. (Bates, Douglas)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to PEGGY SKELTON. (Stanley, Chelsea)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea R. Stanley on behalf of Plaintiff BRIAN ANDERSON. (Stanley, Chelsea)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff BRIAN ANDERSON. (Stanley, Chelsea)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff BRIAN ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Brian Anderson Affidavit)(Stanley, Chelsea)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff BRIAN ANDERSON. (Stanley, Chelsea)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2021 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/26/2021.(TMC)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant PEGGY SKELTON. (Bartelt, Andrew)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND/OR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. The motion does not comply with the requirements of Local Rule 6-1. The Defendant is given leave to refile a notice or motion (whichever is required) that complies with all the provisions of that rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 3/25/2021. (TMC)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 26, 2021 TO FILE ANSWER AND/OR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS, filed by Defendant PEGGY SKELTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bartelt, Andrew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 RECEIPT #IP072886 for filing fee in the amount of $402.00, paid by Catherine Michael for Defendant. (REO)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J.B. Bartelt on behalf of Defendant PEGGY SKELTON. (Bartelt, Andrew)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington Circuit Court, case number 88C01-2102-PL-84, filed by PEGGY SKELTON. (VOIDED Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6442550) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bartelt, Andrew) Modified on 3/4/2021 (NLR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON v. SKELTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEGGY SKELTON
Represented By: Andrew J.B. Bartelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEGGY Anderson
Represented By: Andrew J.B. Bartelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN ANDERSON
Represented By: Chelsea R. Stanley
Represented By: Douglas B. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?