TINGLE-DUNCIL v. JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: Alaina Tingle-Duncil
Defendant: JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC. and Nurse Washington
Case Number: 4:2023cv00167
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Kellie M Barr
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Entry Directing Development of Exhaustion Defense and Issuing Partial Stay - The exhaustion defense will be resolved pursuant to the following schedule. The defendants shall have through January 8, 2024, in which to either: SEE ORDER. If a dispositive motion is filed, the plaintiff shall have twenty-eight (28) days in which to respond. The movant shall then have fourteen (14) days in which to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 11/27/2023.(JRB)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Muldoon on behalf of Defendant JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Muldoon, Patrick)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT.(Schaefer, Justin)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Schaefer on behalf of Defendant JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Schaefer, Justin)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC..(Dillon, Carol)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Montgomery on behalf of Defendant ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (Montgomery, Travis)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (Dillon, Carol)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Dillon on behalf of Defendant ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (Dillon, Carol)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Entry Regarding Service - The Court's Order Screening Complaint directed the clerk to issue the proposed summons attached to the complaint. Dkt. 5 at 2. But a notice of lawsuit and waiver of the service of summons were attached rather than a proposed summons. Accordingly, the Court amends its Order Screening Complaint to the extent that counsel shall effect service on the defendants consistent with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/12/2023.(JRB)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT - Based on the screening standard set forth above, the complaint shall proceed as presented. The clerk is directed to issue the proposed summons attached to the complaint. Dkt. 1-2. The plaintiff shall complete service on the defendants consistent with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/10/2023.(AAS)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (LF)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LF)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Clayton Culotta on behalf of Plaintiff Alaina Tingle-Duncil. (Culotta, J.)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Alaina Tingle-Duncil. (Filing fee $402, receipt number BINSDC-7833923) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Notice & Waiver req. to All Defendants)(Culotta, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TINGLE-DUNCIL v. JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaina Tingle-Duncil
Represented By: J. Clayton Culotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Patrick Muldoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Carol A. Dillon
Represented By: Travis W. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?