Mott LLC
Debtor: Mott LLC
Us Trustee: United States Trustee
Trustee: Douglas Dean Flugum
Case Number: 1:2021bk00606
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Thad J Collins
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 23 Meeting of Creditors Held Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
August 6, 2021 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#21 Motion to Amend Application) Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting Amended Motion To Employ Attorney (Related Doc #18) Dated and Entered on 8/4/2021. (tsta)
July 26, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Austin G. Collins Filed by Interested Party Gerald D. Ambrose. (Collins, Austin)
July 26, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffrey P. Taylor Filed by Interested Party Gerald D. Ambrose. (Taylor, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2021 Filing 18 REDOCKETED FOR COURT TRACKING PURPOSES Amended Application re: Application to Employ Filed by Mott LLC (related document(s)#17 Application to Employ). (tsta)
July 13, 2021 Filing 17 REDOCKETED IN THE ORIGINAL CASE FOR COURT TRACKING PURPOSES ONLY Application to Employ Ag & Business Legal Strategies as Attorney Filed by Mott LLC (tsta)
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Service re: Order on Motion For Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Mott LLC (related document(s)#9 Order on Motion For Joint Administration). (Peiffer, Austin)
July 11, 2021 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#11 Meeting of Creditors for Ch 11 Subchapter V) Notice Date 07/11/2021. (Admin.)
July 10, 2021 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#4 Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing) Notice Date 07/10/2021. (Admin.)
July 10, 2021 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#9 Order on Motion For Joint Administration) Notice Date 07/10/2021. (Admin.)
July 10, 2021 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#4 Notice And Order re Incomplete Filing) Notice Date 07/10/2021. (Admin.)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 Meeting of Creditors for Ch 11 Small Business Subchapter V 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/10/2021 at 01:00 PM at Cedar Rapids Telephonic 341 Meeting. (jmei)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 Entry: An Order has been entered in this case directing it joint administration with the bankruptcy case of Knutson, LLC, Case No.21-00594, for procedural purposes only, and providing for that joint administration in accordance with the Orders terms. ALL PLEADINGS, MOTIONS & OTHER PAPERS SERVED OR FILED SHALL BE DOCKETED INTO CASE 21-00594 (related document(s)#9 Order on Motion For Joint Administration) (jmei)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case 1:21-bk-594 with Member Case 1:21-bk-606 (Related Doc #3) Dated and Entered on 7/8/2021. (jmei)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement for Small Business, Statement of Operations for Small Business, Tax Documents for the Year for 2019 Filed by Debtor Mott LLC. (Peiffer, Austin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appointment of Trustee for Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V. Douglas Dean Flugum added to the case. 341 Meeting Date: August 10, 2021. 341 Meeting Time: 1:00 pm. Location: Cedar Rapids Telephonic. Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Report on Potential Avoidance Actions - IT IS ORDERED that by no later than 90 days after the filing of the petition, unless the court extends the time on written motion, the debtor or debtors shall file a report with the court which identifies and describes potential actions or proceedings which might be filed under 11 U.S.C. Section(s) 544, 545, 547, 548, and 553. The report shall include (1) each claim under the foregoing subsections which debtor or debtor's counsel believes may be a colorable claim, (2) the entity or entities against whom the claim has been or could be brought, (3) whether the claim previously has been compromised, (4) whether an action or proceeding has been commenced on the claim, (5) the status of any proceedings which have been commenced, and (6) the debtor's plans for bringing actions or proceedings on the claim. The report must include any claims which the debtor may have or may have had against any insider of the debtor. The debtor shall serve a copy of the report on the United States trustee, any entities filing requests for notices under Local Rule 2002.1(b), the creditors included on the list filed pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 1007(d), and upon counsel for any official committee. TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge Thad J. Collins Signed on 7/8/2021. (jmei)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Ch 11 Business Claims - IT IS ORDERED that the claims deadline for all creditors except governmental units is fixed as 9/15/2021. IT IS ORDERED that the time for filing timely claims by governmental units is filing before 180 days after the date of the order for relief. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for equity security holders to file proofs of interest is fixed as 9/15/2021. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk shall give notice of such deadlines and times in the Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, & Deadlines. TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge Thad J. Collins. Signed on 7/8/2021. (jmei)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 Notice and Order re Incomplete Filing (related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) Incomplete Schedules/Statements: Statement of Financial Affairs, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A-H, Corporate Statement due by 7/21/2021. Small Business Incomplete Filings due by 7/15/2021. Attorney or Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Disclosure Statement due 7/21/2021. (jmei)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Mott LLC (Peiffer, Austin)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by L. Ashley Wieck Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Wieck, L. Ashley)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals with Incomplete Schedules. Fee Amount $1738. Debtor(s) Mott LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/5/2021. (Peiffer, Austin)
July 7, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-00606) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A3187848. Fee amount 1738.00. (re:Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Mott LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Mott LLC
Represented By: Austin Peiffer
Represented By: Joseph A. Peiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: L. Ashley Wieck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Douglas Dean Flugum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?