Iowa Premium Beef, LLC et al v. Global Life Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Iowa Premium Beef, LLC and TBI Capital, LLC
Defendant: Rod Spray, Daniel L Brune, James Niles and Global Life Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00039
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Tama
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Presiding Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss. Denied, except granted as to compelling arbitration according to the agreement, and stayed. By not later than 10/1/2013, the parties shall advise this court in writing as to the status of the arbitration. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 7/3/2013. (pac)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, to Compel Arbitration Oral Argument Requested filed by Daniel L Brune, James Niles, Rod Spray, Global Life Capital, LLC. Dismissed unless plaintiff files a supplemental jurisdiction statement by not later than 3/4/2013. (See text of order) Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 2/4/2013. (pac)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 28 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan filed by TBI Capital, LLC, Iowa Premium Beef, LLC. The parties must submit a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan not later than 8/9/2012. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 08/03/2012. (skm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iowa Premium Beef, LLC et al v. Global Life Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Spray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel L Brune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Niles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Life Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa Premium Beef, LLC
Represented By: Brian C Buescher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TBI Capital, LLC
Represented By: Brian C Buescher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?