Byrd v. State of Iowa et al

Plaintiff: Joe Louis Byrd
Defendant: State of Iowa and John Fayram
Case Number: 1:2012cv00099
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Jones
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 10/2/2014. (pac)
September 10, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment or to Reconsider Remedy; denying 49 Motion to Amend/Correct 46 Judgment and Resistance to 47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgment or to Reconsider Remedy. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 9/10/2014. (pac)
July 30, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to dismiss 26 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joe Louis Byrd. Objections to R&R due by 8/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 7/30/14. (ksy)
February 5, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Clarification or for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 2/5/2014. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. State of Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Louis Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fayram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?