Saxton, et al v. Federal Housing Finance Agency, et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Saxton, Ida Saxton and Bradley Paynter
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency, Melvin L Watt and United States Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 1:2015cv00047
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Presiding Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 76 FHFA Motion to Dismiss and granting 77 Treasury Motion to Dismiss. The 61 Amended Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 03/27/2017. (jjh)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Denying Transfer (MDL No. 2713). Signed by Sarah S Vance, Chair of Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 6/2/16. (djs)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. All proceedings in this matter are stayed pending the Panel's determination of whether to transfer the instant action. In the event the Panel denies the motion to transfer, Plaintiffs must file their resistances to the pending 76 and 77 Motions to Dismiss in the instant action by no later than fourteen days after the Panel's decision. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 4/4/2016. (skm)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Stay Briefing on 19 and 20 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 10/20/2015. (skm)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay Submission of a Proposed Scheduling Order Regarding the Filing of an Administrative Record. Defendants are not required to file an administrative record until after the Court has ruled on the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 10/2/15. (ksy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saxton, et al v. Federal Housing Finance Agency, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Saxton
Represented By: Alexander Michael Johnson
Represented By: Sean Patrick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Saxton
Represented By: Alexander Michael Johnson
Represented By: Sean Patrick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Paynter
Represented By: Alexander Michael Johnson
Represented By: Sean Patrick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin L Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?