Westpark Capital, Inc et al v. Woebbeking Enterprises, Ltd
Plaintiff: Westpark Capital, Inc and Richard A Rappaport
Defendant: Woebbeking Enterprises, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2017cv00036
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Tama
Presiding Judge: Leonard T Strand
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
2 Judge: CJ Williams-M
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard A Rappaport, Westpark Capital, Inc (Pace, Steven)
April 25, 2017 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Westpark Capital, Inc (Pace, Steven)
April 19, 2017 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/13/2017 (des)
April 18, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westpark Capital, Inc, Richard A Rappaport. Woebbeking Enterprises served on 4/13/2017, answer due 5/4/2017. (Pace, Steven) Modified text on 4/18/2017 (des)
April 17, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant by Richard A Rappaport, Westpark Capital, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1) (Pace, Steven) Modified on 4/18/2017 to note filed as such pursuant to #5 Order (des)
April 13, 2017 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #2 Complaint, by Richard A Rappaport, Westpark Capital, Inc (Pace, Steven)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Westpark Capital, Inc, Richard A Rappaport (See Order text). Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 4/11/2017. (des)
April 6, 2017 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/27/2017 (des)
April 6, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Woebbeking Enterprises, Ltd. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Cases new case packet) (des)
April 6, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Richard A Rappaport, Westpark Capital, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Pace, Steven)
April 6, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Woebbeking Enterprises, Ltd ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2447766.), filed by Westpark Capital, Inc, Richard A Rappaport. Scheduling Report due by 7/18/2017 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pace, Steven) Modified text on 4/7/2017 (des)
April 6, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE of New Case Filing by Richard A Rappaport, Westpark Capital, Inc. (djs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westpark Capital, Inc et al v. Woebbeking Enterprises, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westpark Capital, Inc
Represented By: Steven J Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Rappaport
Represented By: Steven J Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woebbeking Enterprises, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?