USA v. Adams
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Rossi Lorathio Adams, II, Rossi Adams and Polo
Interested Party: US Probation
Case Number: 1:2018cr00086
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 78 JURY VERDICT as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams II: Guilty on Count 1 of the Indictment. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Verdict) (skm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 76 FINAL Jury Instructions as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II signed by Judge CJ Williams on 4/18/2019. (skm)
April 19, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Receipt for Exhibits as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Trial Exhibits marked Government Exhibits 3A and 7 were released to CRPD on 4/18/2019. Exhibits must be kept in their original form until termination of any appeal in this matter as stated in LR 57B(c), (d), and (e). (skm)
April 18, 2019 Filing 74 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams: Day 4 Jury Trial as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 4/18/2019. Jury returns verdict of guilty. Defendant detained. (Court Reporter: Sarah Dittmar.) (Attachments: #1 Witness and Exhibit List) (pet) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (des)
April 17, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Receipt for Exhibits as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Trial Exhibits marked Government Exhibits 3A and 7 were released to CRPD on 4/17/2019. Exhibits must be kept in their original form until termination of any appeal in this matter as stated in LR 57B(c), (d), and (e). (skm)
April 17, 2019 Filing 71 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams: Day 3 Jury Trial as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 4/17/2019 (Court Reporter: Sarah Dittmar.) (pet) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (des).
April 17, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Receipt for Exhibits as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Trial Exhibits marked Government Exhibits 3A and 7 were released to CRPD on 4/16/2019. Exhibits must be kept in their original form until termination of any appeal in this matter as stated in LR 57B(c), (d), and (e). (jjh) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (skm).
April 16, 2019 Filing 69 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams: Day 2 Jury Trial as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 4/16/2019 (Court Reporter: Patrice Murray.) (pet) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (des)
April 16, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Receipt for Exhibits as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Trial Exhibits marked Government Exhibits 3A and 7 were released to CRPD on 4/15/2019. Exhibits must be kept in their original form until termination of any appeal in this matter as stated in LR 57B(c), (d), and (e). (jjh) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (skm).
April 15, 2019 Filing 67 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams: Day 1 Jury Trial as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 4/15/2019 (Court Reporter: Patrice Murray) (pet) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (des)
April 15, 2019 Filing 66 JURY Instructions as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 4/15/2019. (skm)
April 13, 2019 Filing 64 TRIAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM Supplemental by USA as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (Vavricek, Timothy) Modified text on 4/14/2019 (des)
April 8, 2019 Filing 63 TRIAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by USA as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (Vavricek, Timothy)
April 4, 2019 Filing 61 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams:Final Pretrial Conference as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 4/4/2019 (Court Reporter Patrice Murray.) (pet)
April 4, 2019 Filing 60 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams:Motion Hearing as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 4/4/2019 re #55 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Rossi Adams, Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (Court Reporter Patrice Murray.) (pet)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Regarding Jury Selection as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (see text of Order). Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 4/3/2019. (skm)
April 1, 2019 Set Deadline pursuant to #56 Order re Motion in case as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II #55 SEALED MOTION in Limine . Responses due by 4/3/2019 (des)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II re #55 SEALED MOTION in Limine: Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Any resistance to the motion in limine is due 4/3/2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 03/29/2019. (jjh) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (des)
March 28, 2019 Filing 55 SEALED MOTION in Limine by USA, Rossi Lorathio Adams, II as to Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Swift, Stephen) Modified name of attachment and applicable parties on 3/28/2019 (des)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Jury Selection set for 4/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2019 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 03/21/2019. (jjh)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 49 Sealed Motion to Amend Conditions of Release as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 02/15/2019. (jjh)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re #42 Jury Instructions as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: If the parties wish to file additional objections to the Court's Jury Instructions or request additional instructions, they must do so by no later than Friday, April 5, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 2/11/2019. (skm)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER to Continue - Ends of Justice as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Time excluded from 2/1/2019 until 4/15/2019. Jury Trial reset for 4/15/2019 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 8:30 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Jury Instructions due by 4/3/2019. Trial Related Motions due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 2/4/2019. (pac)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Cancelling Trial as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. The trial currently scheduled for 2/4/2019, is cancelled and will be rescheduled in a subsequent order from the Court. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 02/01/2019. (jjh)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re Jury Instructions as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 02/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Jury Instructions) (jjh)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SEALED ORDER granting #27 Sealed Motion in Limine as to Rossi Lorathio Adams II (1). Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/31/19. (ksy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 39 Objection to Jury Instructions by USA (Vavricek, Timothy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE Proposed Jury Instructions 16 and 17 by Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Jury Instructions 16 and 17) (Swift, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams:Final Pretrial Conference as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 1/28/2019 (Court Reporter Patrice Murray.) (pet)
January 28, 2019 Filing 35 TRIAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by USA as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (Vavricek, Timothy)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER regarding jury instructions as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Objections due by 01/29/2019 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Draft Jury Instructions) (pet)
January 25, 2019 Filing 31 CONSENT to Jury Selection before a US Magistrate Judge by USA and Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Roberts on 1/25/2019. (skm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 30 (FILED IN ERROR) CONSENT to Jury Selection before a US Magistrate Judge (Swift, Stephen) Modified on 1/25/2019 to note this is a proposed order filed in error (des)
January 23, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED Jury Instructions by USA as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (Vavricek, Timothy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 SEALED MOTION in Limine by USA, US Probation, Rossi Lorathio Adams, II as to Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Government's Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit 1) (Vavricek, Timothy)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Attorneys/Defendant Meeting set for 2/4/2019 at 08:30 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Jury Selection set for 2/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Jury Trial set for 2/4/2019 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 01/16/2019. (jjh)
January 10, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Status Conference as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 1/10/2019. (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (pac)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Dismiss Indictment as to Rossi Lorathio Adams II. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/10/2019. (skm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 RESISTANCE by USA as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Indictment (Vavricek, Timothy)
December 13, 2018 Filing 19 BRIEF by Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II re #18 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rossi Adams, Rossi Lorathio Adams, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Domain to Another Registrar, #2 Exhibit B - Accept or Decline a Transfer to Another Registrar) (Swift, Stephen) Modified text and names of attachments on 12/13/2018 (des)
December 13, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Indictment by Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. (Swift, Stephen) Modified text on 12/13/2018 (des)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 MOTION to Continue Trial Unresisted as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Time excluded from 10/11/2018 until 2/4/2019. Jury Trial reset for the two-week period beginning 2/4/2019 in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Pretrial Conference reset for 2/4/2019 at 8:30 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Jury Instructions due by 1/23/2019. Motions due by 12/31/2018. Trial Related Motions due by 1/17/2019. Status Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 12:00 PM in Ctrm 4 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 10/18/2018. (pac)
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams:Status Conference as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II held on 10/18/2018 (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (pet)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Trial Unresisted by Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. (Swift, Stephen) Modified text on 10/12/2018 (des)
October 1, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE Regarding United States Passport of Criminal Defendant by US Probation as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Notice) (skm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 13 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. (skm)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED DISCOVERY ORDER as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 9/17/2018. (pac)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPEARANCE BOND AND ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 09/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 No Contact List) (jjh)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Jury Trial set for 11/13/2018 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Jury Instructions due by 11/1/2018. Motions due by 10/12/2018. Status Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 12:00 PM in Ctrm 4 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Trial Related Motions due by 10/26/2018. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 09/14/2018. (jjh) Modified motions DL on 9/14/2018 (jjh).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) STIPULATED DISCOVERY ORDER as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 09/14/2018. (jjh) Modified text on 9/14/2018 (pac).
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge CJ Williams: Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams II (1) Count 1 held on 9/14/2018. Attorney Stephen Swift for defendant, and defendant pled not guilty. Defendant released. (Court Reporter FTR Gold) (jjh)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Appointing CJA Panel Attorney Stephen Swift as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Financial Affidavit due by 9/19/2018. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 09/14/2018. (jjh)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/13/18 in case as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. (ksy)
September 14, 2018 Attorney update in case as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Attorney Stephen A Swift for Rossi Lorathio Adams, II added pursuant to the CJA Panel Administrator under the direction of Judge CJ Williams (conflicts list reviewed; none found). (pac)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING HEARINGS as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II: Initial Appearance and Arraignment set for 9/14/2018 11:45 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/14/2018. (skm)
September 14, 2018 INDICTMENT and Case unsealed as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Action taken pursuant to defendant's arrest. (pac)
September 12, 2018 Case as to Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams II reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER sealing Indictment and Warrant until the arrest of Defendant Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 8/21/2018 (eUSA, eUSM, eUSP). (skm)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 INDICTMENT as to Rossi Lorathio Adams II, Count 1. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Indictment) (eUSA, eUSM, eUSP) (skm) Modified text on 9/14/2018 (pac).
August 21, 2018 Judge update in case as to Rossi Lorathio Adams, II. Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added. Conflicts checked for parties and AUSA Vavricek; none found. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossi Lorathio Adams, II
Represented By: Stephen A Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossi Adams
Represented By: Stephen A Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polo
Represented By: Stephen A Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Probation
Represented By: uspNotify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Vavricek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?