Rockwell Collins, Inc v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Plaintiff: Rockwell Collins, Inc
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1362 and Local 1362 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Case Number: 1:2018cv00082
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of Case Settlement: The court has been advised that this action has been settled. The parties shall have to and including, the date listed at end of this docket entry, to file their settlement documents. Dismissal Papers Deadline are due by 10/17/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 9/14/2018. (des)
September 14, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by Rockwell Collins, Inc (Baier, Kelly)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 RESISTANCE to Motion re #13 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Stay filed by Local 1362 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Willems, Nathan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Rockwell Collins, Inc, Counter Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay) (Baier, Kelly)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint and Counterclaim filed against Rockwell Collins, Inc by Local 1362 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2)(Willems, Nathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED Complaint against Local 1362 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, filed by Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Baier, Kelly)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Carrington, Melissa)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Local 1362 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Willems, Nathan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 RESISTANCE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Baier, Kelly)
September 4, 2018 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney (conflicts checked; none found). (skm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Collins, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Rockwell Collins, Inc for Rockwell Collins, Inc, Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Baier, Kelly)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1362: Response ddl 09/04/2018 (Attachment #1 Brief ) (Willems, Nathan) Modified text on 08/22/2018 (kfs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Rockwell Collins, Inc by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1362. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Willems, Nathan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed August 16, 2018 Acknowledgement filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1362. (Willems, Nathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1362. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/10/2018. (ksy)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1362( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2751327.), filed by Rockwell Collins, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 11/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Baier, Kelly) Modified text on 8/10/2018 (ksy). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy).
August 10, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts reviewed as to parties and attorney, none found. (ksy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwell Collins, Inc v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell Collins, Inc
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1362
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 1362 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Nathan T Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?