United States of America v. Houser, et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Discover Bank, The unknown guardians, conservators and trustees o any way under legal disability, Linda Lee Beckett, State of Iowa, Iowa Department of Revenue, Estate of Maxine Houser, Deborah Dee Snider, The unknown heirs, the unknown spouses of the heir assignees of such of the defendants as may be deceased, Parties in Possession, Iowa Department of Revenue, Maxine Houser, Unknown Guardians, Conservators and Trustees and Unknown Heirs
Case Number: 1:2018cv00083
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
County: Linn
0 Judge: Kelly Mahoney
1 Judge: Linda R Reade
2 Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 8 USM RETURN OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Motion for Service by Publication. (src)
September 20, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Consent to Decree by Iowa Department of Revenue.(Thibodeau, Michael)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Magistrate Judge CJ Williams-M no longer assigned to case.(Conflicts reviewed, none found) (ksy)
September 4, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Discover Bank waiver sent on 8/24/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Schunk, Jacob)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER for Service by Publication: Granting #2 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 08/16/18. (kfs)
August 16, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added. Motions referred to Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. (Conflicts reviewed, none found) (ksy)
August 16, 2018 Judge Linda R Reade added. Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney no longer assigned to case. Conflicts reviewed, none found. (ksy)
August 15, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Linda Lee Beckett, Discover Bank, Estate of Maxine Houser, Parties in Possession, Deborah Dee Snider, State of Iowa, Iowa Department of Revenue, The unknown guardians, conservators and trustees o any way under legal disability, The unknown heirs, the unknown spouses of the heir assignees of such of the defendants as may be deceased. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Foreclosure Case Packet) (ksy)
August 15, 2018 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/15/2018. (ksy)
August 15, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Conflicts reviewed as to parties and AUSA, none found. (ksy)
August 15, 2018 2 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff United States of America (Schunk, Jacob)
August 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Dismissal Deadline 11/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Schunk, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Houser, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The unknown guardians, conservators and trustees o any way under legal disability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Lee Beckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Iowa, Iowa Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Maxine Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Dee Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The unknown heirs, the unknown spouses of the heir assignees of such of the defendants as may be deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parties in Possession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Revenue
Represented By: Michael Kenny Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Guardians, Conservators and Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?