Weems Industries, Inc v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc

Plaintiff: Weems Industries, Inc. and Weems Industries, Inc
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. and Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00086
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J Visser on behalf of Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (Visser, Kevin)
October 4, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams: Chief Judge Leonard T Strand no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Weems Industries, Inc. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc waiver sent on 8/22/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Ogden, Dennis)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Weems Industries, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Weems Global, LLC, Corporate Parent Wemyss, Inc., Corporate Parent Je Pense, LLC for Weems Industries, Inc. (Ogden, Dennis)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: AO 120 and #1 Complaint mailed to the Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (des)
August 23, 2018 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/13/2018 (des)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
August 23, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts - none found. (des)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2758053) filed by Weems Industries, Inc. Scheduling Report Due 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ogden, Dennis) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weems Industries, Inc v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weems Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weems Industries, Inc
Represented By: Dennis P Ogden
Represented By: Matthew Robert O'Hollearn
Represented By: Brian J Laurenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?