Doss v. Iowa Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lee Doss
Defendant: Tracy Dietsch, Hailey Hatrick, Dave Siler, c/o Paul Nemmers, Anne Babbi, William Sperfslage, Mike Heinriecy, Iowa Department of Corrections and Paul Nemmers
Case Number: 1:2018cv00087
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth Lee Doss. (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to Local Rule 41(a)(4). Unless appropriate action is taken by 10/17/2018, this action will be dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 10/03/18. (Attachments: #1 LR 41) (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf) Modified text on 10/4/2018 (skm).
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Magistrate Judge CJ Williams-M no longer assigned to case. (Conflicts reviewed, none found) (ksy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Correspondence re #1 Complaint by Clerk of Court to Plaintiff Kenneth Lee Doss. Filing fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 9/19/2018. (copy w/nef, docket sheet and In Forma Pauperis form to non-ecf filer) (des)
September 5, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added. Clerk checked for conflicts - none found. (des)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00273. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/4/2018. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/5/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anne Babbi, Tracy Dietsch, Hailey Hatrick, Mike Heinriecy, Iowa Department of Corrections, Paul Nemmers, Dave Siler, William Sperfslage, filed by Kenneth Lee Doss. (krn) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/5/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss v. Iowa Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lee Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Dietsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hailey Hatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: c/o Paul Nemmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Babbi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sperfslage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Heinriecy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Nemmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?