Moore v. Sperfslage et al
Plaintiff: Davonte Derrick Moore
Defendant: Paul Nemmers, Justin Kracht and William Sperfslage
Case Number: 1:2018cv00096
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Magistrate Judge CJ Williams-M no longer assigned to case. (Conflicts reviewed, none found) (ksy)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00252. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (NEF w/copy of #3 Order mailed to Plt) (PSLC notified).
September 7, 2018 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/6/2018. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/7/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Davonte Moore. (Attachments: #1 Form C, #2 Form D) (krn) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/7/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Kracht, Paul Nemmers, William Sperfslage, filed by Davonte Moore. (krn) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 9/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Sperfslage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Nemmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Kracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sperfslage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davonte Derrick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?