Davenport v. Caledonia Haulers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Larry Davenport
Defendant: Caledonia Haulers, Inc., Caledonia Haulers, LLC and Caledonia Haulers, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00128
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Discovery Pursuant to 56(d) past deadline by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Motion for Discovery Pursuant to 56(d), #2 Declaration) (Wilson, Emily)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Wilson, Emily)
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to #13 Resistance to #9 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Reponse to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts, #2 Supplemental Appendix in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment) (Carrington, Melissa) Modified text on 1/28/2019 (mmc).
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 UNRESISTED Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by Larry Davenport: The Court hereby vacates its prior order at #18 . The Clerk of Court is directed to place the appendix at #13 -4 under seal. Plaintiff does not need to take any action regarding redacting the appendix at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/24/2019. (pac)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (VACATED) ORDER denying #17 Unresisted Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Plaintiff shall submit a redacted version of the appendix to the Clerk of Court by 1/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/23/2019. (pac) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (pac).
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 UNRESISTED Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Wilson, Emily)
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC, filed by Larry Davenport. (ksy)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unresisted Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Clerk's Office is directed to detach and file the Amended Complaint attachedat Doc. 14-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 1/22/19. (ksy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 UNRESISTED Motion for Leave to Amend Petition by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Attachments: #1 Amended Petition) (Wilson, Emily)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 RESISTANCE to Motion re #9 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Larry Davenport. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts, #4 Appendix) (Wilson, Emily)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Larry Davenport: Responses due by 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 01/04/2019. (jjh)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Larry Davenport, Caledonia Haulers, Inc, and Caledonia Haulers, LLC, this case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts for final disposition. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 1/3/2019. (skm) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (skm).
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Larry Davenport (Wilson, Emily)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC Responses due by 1/4/2019 Check Status on MJ Consent due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Appendix) (Carrington, Melissa) Modified name of Attachment #1 on 12/26/2018 (des)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC (Carrington, Melissa)
December 11, 2018 Answer due from All Defendants 12/24/18. Pursuant to order #7 . (dmc)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Petition is December 24, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 12/11/18. (dmc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Caledonia Haulers, Inc, Caledonia Haulers, LLC (Carrington, Melissa)
December 4, 2018 Set Deadlines: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/25/2018. (mmc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Please find new removal case packet attached. (mmc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Larry Davenport. (mmc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/3/2019. (mmc)
December 4, 2018 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified with parties, attorneys, and MAR. (mmc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Caledonia Haulers, Inc., Caledonia Haulers, LLC. (Carrington, Melissa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court in and for Linn County, case number LACV091512. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2824442), filed by Caledonia Haulers, Inc., Caledonia Haulers, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 2/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Rule 81 Certification, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baier, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Caledonia Haulers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caledonia Haulers, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caledonia Haulers, LLC
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caledonia Haulers, Inc
Represented By: Kelly R Baier
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Davenport
Represented By: Mark D Sherinian
Represented By: Emily Elaine Wilson
Represented By: Melissa Carol Hasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?