Darling et al v. Boecker et al

Plaintiff: Frank Massingham, Brian Darling and Brian Hutchcroft-Darling
Defendant: Justin Boecker, City of Cedar Rapids, Jerry A Vander Sanden, Linn County, IA and Cedar Rapids, City of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Mark A Roberts
1 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Hutchcroft-Darling, Frank Massingham. Cedar Rapids, City of waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Hutchcroft-Darling, Frank Massingham. Justin Boecker waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Hutchcroft-Darling, Frank Massingham. Jerry A Vander Sanden waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Hutchcroft-Darling, Frank Massingham. Linn County, IA waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Frerichs, Thomas)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Justin Boecker, City of Cedar Rapids, Linn County, IA, Jerry A Vander Sanden. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
February 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2863038.), filed by Brian Darling, Frank Massingham. Scheduling Report due by 5/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Frerichs, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darling et al v. Boecker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Boecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cedar Rapids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry A Vander Sanden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linn County, IA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Rapids, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Massingham
Represented By: Thomas P Frerichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Darling
Represented By: Thomas P Frerichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hutchcroft-Darling
Represented By: Thomas P Frerichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?