Easterday v. Whirlpool Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Sherin Easterday
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation and Rick Raue
Case Number: 1:2019cv00020
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 UNRESISTED Motion for extension of time to file resistance to #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sherin Easterday. Resistance due by 5/2/2019. All other deadlines remain in effect and are not extended. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 4/10/19. (ksy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 UNRESISTED Motion for extension of time to file resistance to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Sherin Easterday (Humphrey, Marc)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Resist #3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Raue. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 3/6/2019. (pac)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F Doyle on behalf of Defendants Rick Raue and Whirlpool Corporation. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2019. (des)
March 6, 2019 ***Attorney John Francis Doyle for Defendants Rick Raue and Whirlpool Corporation added pursuant to #11 Text Order (des)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole H Howell on behalf of Defendants Rick Raue and Whirlpool Corporation. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2019. (des)
March 6, 2019 ***Attorney Nicole Hininger Howell for Defendants Rick Raue and Whirlpool Corporation added pursuant to #10 Text Order (des)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole H. Howell ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2887991) by Defendants Rick Raue, Whirlpool Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wolle, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Doyle ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2887972) by Defendants Rick Raue, Whirlpool Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wolle, Thomas)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 UNRESISTED Motion for additional 45 days to file resistance by Plaintiff Sherin Easterday (Humphrey, Marc) Modified on 3/4/2019 to add link to #3 Motion to Dismiss (des)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Whirlpool Corporation (Wolle, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/12/2019 (des)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Sherin Easterday (des)
February 19, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys - none found. (des)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Raue by Defendants Rick Raue, Whirlpool Corporation. Responses due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Wolle, Thomas) Modified on 2/19/2019 to remove caps in text (des)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Rick Raue, Whirlpool Corporation.(Wolle, Thomas) Modified on 2/19/2019 to remove caps in text (des)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn, case number LACV091946. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2875303), filed by Whirlpool Corporation, Rick Raue. Scheduling Report due by 4/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Local Rule 81 Statement, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wolle, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easterday v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Represented By: Nicole Hininger Howell
Represented By: John Francis Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raue
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Represented By: Nicole Hininger Howell
Represented By: John Francis Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherin Easterday
Represented By: Marc A Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?